NY A10193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that certain schools shall experience no financial harm for reduced enrollment or inability to operate for the full 180 session days due to the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that certain schools shall experience no financial harm for reduced enrollment or inability to operate for the full 180 session days due to the outbreak of coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-23Senate3RD READING CAL.1019
2020-07-23SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8014C
2020-07-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.201
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.201
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-03-24Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S08014 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10193

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10193
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10193&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A10193#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback