NY A10194 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the correctional association to access, visit, inspect, and examine all state correctional facilities without advance notice to the department; during such visits the association shall have the power to interview and converse publicly or confidentially with any correctional employee, any incarcerated individual, and any other person providing services in a state correctional facility, whether or not employed by such facility.
Title
Permits the correctional association to access, visit, inspect, and examine all state correctional facilities without advance notice to the department; during such visits the association shall have the power to interview and converse publicly or confidentially with any correctional employee, any incarcerated individual, and any other person providing services in a state correctional facility, whether or not employed by such facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.30 |
2020-12-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.320 |
2020-11-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | substituted for a10194 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | referred to correction |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.844 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted by s8046 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.265 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08046 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.30