NY A10220 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the incorporation of certain businesses for the purpose of practicing professional geology.
Title
Relates to the incorporation of certain businesses for the purpose of practicing professional geology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.302 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1247 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8086A |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.932 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | print number 10220a |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08086 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10220A