NY A10225 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - to attorney-general for opinion
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - to attorney-general for opinion
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires parity in the mental and physical health treatment of the residents of New York state; provides that both mental and physical health "will be matters of public concern and provision therefor shall be made by the state and by such of its subdivisions".
Title
Requires parity in the mental and physical health treatment of the residents of New York state; provides that both mental and physical health "will be matters of public concern and provision therefor shall be made by the state and by such of its subdivisions".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | print number 10225a |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2020-05-08 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-03-27 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07120 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION