NY A10229 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-07 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the imposition of sales and compensating use taxes in the county of Putnam from November 30, 2020 until November 30, 2022.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the imposition of sales and compensating use taxes in the county of Putnam from November 30, 2020 until November 30, 2022.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-03-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |