NY A10236 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.155
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain water charges for hospitals and charities in New York city; extends expiration until September 1, 2020.
Title
Relates to certain water charges for hospitals and charities in New York city; extends expiration until September 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.155 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.980 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8071 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.934 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S08071 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10236