NY A10251 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Cohoes, in the county of Albany, to offer certain retirement options to police officer Jeffrey Bressette.
Title
Authorizes the city of Cohoes, in the county of Albany, to offer certain retirement options to police officer Jeffrey Bressette.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.156 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1166 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8208 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.183 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.183 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08208 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10251