NY A10252 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to deferring certain property taxes during a declared state disaster emergency and providing for installment payments thereafter to be determined by the local legislative body.
Title
Relates to deferring certain property taxes during a declared state disaster emergency and providing for installment payments thereafter to be determined by the local legislative body.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.29 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | substituted for a10252a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.645 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8138B |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8138A |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-03-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | substituted by s8138b |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.29 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.29 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-25 | Assembly | print number 10252a |
2020-05-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08138 (Same As) 2020-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR