NY A10275 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - signed chap.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the reimbursement of shelter costs and crime scene cleanup for certain, non-injured victims including battered spouses and children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the reimbursement of shelter costs and crime scene cleanup for certain, non-injured victims including battered spouses and children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-22Senatesigned chap.204
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1376
2018-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7993
2018-05-08SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-05-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.32
2018-05-08Assemblyrules report cal.32
2018-05-08Assemblyreported
2018-05-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-04-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-04-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07993 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10275

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10275
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10275&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10275#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback