NY A10290 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no court shall issue a warrant of eviction or judgment of possession against a residential tenant that has suffered a financial hardship for the non-payment of rent that accrues or becomes due during the COVID-19 covered period.
Title
Provides that no court shall issue a warrant of eviction or judgment of possession against a residential tenant that has suffered a financial hardship for the non-payment of rent that accrues or becomes due during the COVID-19 covered period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.2 |
2020-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.127 |
2020-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.31 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10290b |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.649 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8192B |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-05-08 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8192A |
2020-05-08 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8192b |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.31 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10290b |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | print number 10290a |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08192 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.2