NY A10303 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - VETOED MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - VETOED MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to paratransit services within the state and city of New York during the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic.
Title
Relates to paratransit services within the state and city of New York during the coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.54 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.33 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10303b |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.642 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8119C |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8119B |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8119A |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-03-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8119c |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.33 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10303b |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | print number 10303a |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08119 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - VETOED MEMO.54