NY A10307 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.233
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reimbursement of employment-related transportation expenses incurred due to the physical injuries sustained as a direct result of a crime.
Title
Relates to the reimbursement of employment-related transportation expenses incurred due to the physical injuries sustained as a direct result of a crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.233 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.203 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10307 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.222 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.683 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5443 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.203 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.203 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05443 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.233