NY A10309 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the financing and construction of facilities by the dormitory authority for North Country School.
Title
Provides for the financing and construction of facilities by the dormitory authority for North Country School.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.159 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1014 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8059 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.964 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08059 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10309