NY A10311 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.410
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of the Division of Homeland Security and Emergency Services in consultation with New York state fire service organizations, to develop a plan to increase the number of skills required as part of the Firefighter certification, or the Firefighter Recruit I and II certifications, which can be completed at a trainee's home department or online.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of the Division of Homeland Security and Emergency Services in consultation with New York state fire service organizations, to develop a plan to increase the number of skills required as part of the Firefighter certification, or the Firefighter Recruit I and II certifications, which can be completed at a trainee's home department or online.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.410
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.849
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7373C
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.184
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.184
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-30Assemblyprint number 10311b
2018-05-30Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2018-05-15Assemblyprint number 10311a
2018-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2018-04-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07373 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10311B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10311
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10311A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10311B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10311&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10311#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback