NY A10316 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8832
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8832
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to the Jaam'e Masjid Bellmore LI Inc. for the 2015-2016 and the 2016-2017 assessment rolls.
Title
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to the Jaam'e Masjid Bellmore LI Inc. for the 2015-2016 and the 2016-2017 assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8832 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.350 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | print number 10316a |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08832 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.451