NY A10326 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health care employers from penalizing employees because of complaints of employer violations.
Title
Prohibits health care employers from penalizing employees because of complaints of employer violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.117 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10326a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.658 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8397A |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8397a |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.34 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10326a |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08397 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.117