NY A10327 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.248
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes fire districts to expend from revenues amounts appropriated for cost of insurance to provide firefighters with an enhanced cancer disability benefit insurance program.
Title
Authorizes fire districts to expend from revenues amounts appropriated for cost of insurance to provide firefighters with an enhanced cancer disability benefit insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.248 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.949 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8019A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.118 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.118 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 10327a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08019 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10327A