NY A10328 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - print number 10328a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - print number 10328a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Automatically extends enrollment of individuals in the rent increase exemption program for low income elderly persons and persons with disabilities pursuant to section 467-b or 467-c of the real property tax law, the senior citizen homeowners' exemption program pursuant to section 467 of the real property tax law or the disabled homeowners' exemption program pursuant to section 459-c of the real property tax law until January 1, 2021 in response to novel coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Title
Automatically extends enrollment of individuals in the rent increase exemption program for low income elderly persons and persons with disabilities pursuant to section 467-b or 467-c of the real property tax law, the senior citizen homeowners' exemption program pursuant to section 467 of the real property tax law or the disabled homeowners' exemption program pursuant to section 459-c of the real property tax law until January 1, 2021 in response to novel coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Assembly | print number 10328a |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2020-04-22 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S08401 (Same As) 2020-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 8401A