NY A10335 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau to accept an application for retroactive real property tax exemption from Community Mainstreaming Associates, Inc. for a certain parcel in the town of Hempstead.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau to accept an application for retroactive real property tax exemption from Community Mainstreaming Associates, Inc. for a certain parcel in the town of Hempstead.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.195 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a10335a |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.729 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8068B |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8068A |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s8068b |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.139 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 10335a |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2020-04-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08068 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.195