NY A10336 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to sexual offenses by health care or mental health care providers; requires the professional conduct officer designated to investigate a complaint of a licensee's professional misconduct to report certain sex offenses to the appropriate law enforcement official or authority.
Title
Relates to sexual offenses by health care or mental health care providers; requires the professional conduct officer designated to investigate a complaint of a licensee's professional misconduct to report certain sex offenses to the appropriate law enforcement official or authority.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.365 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1479 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7456B |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.462 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.462 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | print number 10336b |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | print number 10336a |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07456 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10336B