NY A10337 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changes in health insurance contracts or plans for retired officers, employees, and their families.
Title
Relates to changes in health insurance contracts or plans for retired officers, employees, and their families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8118 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.352 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08118 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.367