NY A10342 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions of law authorizing the hunting of big game in the county of Albany with rifles.
Title
Extends certain provisions of law authorizing the hunting of big game in the county of Albany with rifles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.160 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1036 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8162 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.892 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08162 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10342