NY A10348 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to period of probable usefulness of certain judgments, compromised claims or settled claims.
Title
Extends provisions relating to period of probable usefulness of certain judgments, compromised claims or settled claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.87 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.684 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7855 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.893 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07855 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10348