NY A10355 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to urban development action areas from June 30, 2018 until June 30, 2021.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to urban development action areas from June 30, 2018 until June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.88 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2095 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.937 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08725 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CITIES