NY A10361 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.303
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to the operation of personal watercraft and specialty prop-craft from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021.
Title
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to the operation of personal watercraft and specialty prop-craft from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.303 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1650 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8179 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.939 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S08179 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10361