NY A10369 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.249
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain public school facilities to retain on premises at least one functional cardiac automated external defibrillator, in relation to naming such act the "Louis Acompora AED's in schools act".
Title
Relates to requiring certain public school facilities to retain on premises at least one functional cardiac automated external defibrillator, in relation to naming such act the "Louis Acompora AED's in schools act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.249 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.964 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8124 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.186 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08124 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10369