NY A10371 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.278
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.278
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain reforested lands in the town of Italy, county of Yates on the condition that certain other lands are dedicated as reforested land.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain reforested lands in the town of Italy, county of Yates on the condition that certain other lands are dedicated as reforested land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.278 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.141 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | substituted for a10371a |
2020-06-10 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.739 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 8344A |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s8344a |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.141 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 10371a |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08344 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.278