NY A10403 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposal of property upon a judgment or order of forfeiture; requires a percentage of money from such disposal of property to be deposited into a subaccount of the general fund to be used for law enforcement diversion purposes.
Title
Relates to the disposal of property upon a judgment or order of forfeiture; requires a percentage of money from such disposal of property to be deposited into a subaccount of the general fund to be used for law enforcement diversion purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.206 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2125 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8760 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1046 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08760 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10403