NY A10404 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes audio-only and video-only telehealth and telemedicine services in those telehealth and telemedicine services eligible for reimbursement.
Title
Includes audio-only and video-only telehealth and telemedicine services in those telehealth and telemedicine services eligible for reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.124 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.38 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10404a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.667 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8416 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.38 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10404a |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08416 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.124