NY A10410 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would expand to the rest of the state and make permanent a current pilot project limited to certain counties that was established via chapter 330 of the laws of 2007. This bill would facilitate expeditious service of process of orders of protection via electronic means, thereby enhancing victim safety.
Title
Authorizes the facsimile transmission or transmission by electronic means of orders of protection and temporary orders of protection for the purpose of the service thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | signed chap.261 | |
2010-07-19 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-05-26 | 3RD READING CAL.573 | |
2010-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7289 | |
2010-04-21 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-04-21 | delivered to senate | |
2010-04-21 | passed assembly | |
2010-04-15 | advanced to third reading cal.795 | |
2010-04-13 | reported | |
2010-04-13 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-03-25 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S7289 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10410