NY A10410 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.412
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a definition for electric energy storage equipment; further provides a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a definition for electric energy storage equipment; further provides a tax abatement for electric energy storage equipment placed in service from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.412
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.2018
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8971
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.187
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.187
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-19Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S08971 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10410

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10410&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10410&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10410
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10410&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10410&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10410&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10410&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10410#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback