NY A10415 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s8066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs; provides that deputy sheriffs shall receive a pension of three-quarters of their final average salary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13Assemblysubstituted by s8066
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.121
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.121
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-15Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-19Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S08066 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.366

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback