NY A10428 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-21 - ordered to third reading rules cal.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term kinship caregiver.
Title
Defines the term kinship caregiver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.269 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.269 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S08332 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to children and families