NY A10445 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8254a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8254a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Peconic Bay region septic system replacement loan program; defines terms; authorizes any town in the Peconic Bay region to establish a septic system replacement loan program using water quality improvement monies from the Peconic Bay region community preservation funds; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the Peconic Bay region septic system replacement loan program; defines terms; authorizes any town in the Peconic Bay region to establish a septic system replacement loan program using water quality improvement monies from the Peconic Bay region community preservation funds; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s8254a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.356 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 10445a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08254 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.501