NY A10447 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts the city of Middletown from the requirement that such city maintain a board for the licensing of master plumbers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts the city of Middletown from the requirement that such city maintain a board for the licensing of master plumbers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.343
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1440
2018-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8197
2018-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-06Assemblyhome rule request
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1047
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-04-23Assemblyreferred to cities

Same As/Similar To

S08197 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10447

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback