NY A10452 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the dormitory authority to construct and finance certain facilities of the New York Military Academy.
Title
Authorizes the dormitory authority to construct and finance certain facilities of the New York Military Academy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.163 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1250 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8296 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.965 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08296 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10452