NY A10453 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7118a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7118a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Yorktown, in the county of Westchester, to alienate certain parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Yorktown, in the county of Westchester, to alienate certain parklands.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7118a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.357 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10453a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07118 (Same As) 2018-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.197