NY A10454 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8178
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Validates certain acts by the Roscoe central school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the education department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Validates certain acts by the Roscoe central school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the education department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s8178
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.358
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-23Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S08178 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.369

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback