NY A10463 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the review of policies and practices pertaining to infectious disease outbreaks in correctional facilities, including the treatment and prevention of the disease among inmates and staff.
Title
Relates to the review of policies and practices pertaining to infectious disease outbreaks in correctional facilities, including the treatment and prevention of the disease among inmates and staff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.62 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.365 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.856 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8315A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.270 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 10463a |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08315 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.62