NY A10464 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.220
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.220
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to land used in agricultural production.
Title
Relates to land used in agricultural production.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.220 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.860 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8464A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.206 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.206 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | print number 10464a |
2020-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S08464 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.220