NY A10465 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to aid for library construction; provides that public libraries that received aid for projects commencing July 1, 2017 through July 1, 2019 that are unable to complete such projects due to the state disaster emergency declared pursuant to Executive Order No. 202, as amended, shall be provided an additional twelve months from the statutory project end date to complete such projects.
Title
Relates to aid for library construction; provides that public libraries that received aid for projects commencing July 1, 2017 through July 1, 2019 that are unable to complete such projects due to the state disaster emergency declared pursuant to Executive Order No. 202, as amended, shall be provided an additional twelve months from the statutory project end date to complete such projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.120 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.43 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a10465 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.661 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8410 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.43 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S08410 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.120