NY A10467 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents temporary questioning of person solely because such person is wearing a mask during a state emergency for an epidemic or pandemic.
Title
Prevents temporary questioning of person solely because such person is wearing a mask during a state emergency for an epidemic or pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08323 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - REFERRED TO CODES