NY A10468 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the reclassification of controlled substances by regulation; authorizes the commissioner of health to reclassify controlled substances by regulation or emergency regulation if the substance is redesignated or rescheduled.
Title
Relates to authorizing the reclassification of controlled substances by regulation; authorizes the commissioner of health to reclassify controlled substances by regulation or emergency regulation if the substance is redesignated or rescheduled.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.164 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1874 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8275B |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.232 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.232 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 10468b |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | print number 10468a |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08275 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10468B