NY A10471 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for contracts for the provision of special education and related services for certain patients hospitalized in hospitals operated by the office of mental health.
Title
Extends authorization for contracts for the provision of special education and related services for certain patients hospitalized in hospitals operated by the office of mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.89 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1462 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8325 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.855 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08325 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10471