NY A10472 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law implementing the federal individuals with disabilities education improvement act of 2004.
Title
Extends provisions of law implementing the federal individuals with disabilities education improvement act of 2004.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.90 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1463 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8331 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.856 |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08331 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10472