NY A10479 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of New York city, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of New York city, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for New York city; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.
Title
Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of New York city, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of New York city, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for New York city; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.91 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2088 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.60 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.60 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-27 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S08553 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CITIES