NY A10486 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes continuing care retirement communities to adopt a written cybersecurity policy and requires such policies to be self-certified and approved by the superintendent.
Title
Authorizes continuing care retirement communities to adopt a written cybersecurity policy and requires such policies to be self-certified and approved by the superintendent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-07 | Senate | vetoed memo.293 |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1387 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7940B |
2018-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 10486b |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.122 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.122 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | print number 10486a |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07940 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10486B