NY A10487 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.165
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for stenographers in the county of Broome; authorizes the district attorney of Broome county to appoint a stenographer residing in the county of Onondaga or in any county of the sixth judicial district.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for stenographers in the county of Broome; authorizes the district attorney of Broome county to appoint a stenographer residing in the county of Onondaga or in any county of the sixth judicial district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.165 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1604 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8282 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1049 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08282 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10487