NY A10494 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits any uninsured individual to receive free coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) testing; such information shall be afforded confidentiality protection.
Title
Permits any uninsured individual to receive free coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) testing; such information shall be afforded confidentiality protection.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.328 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.328 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | print number 10494a |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08123 (Same As) 2020-07-17 - PRINT NUMBER 8123B