NY A10518 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - ordered to third reading rules cal.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - ordered to third reading rules cal.51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to place a moratorium on tax foreclosures and tax lien sales for a period of up to five years after the COVID-19 covered period.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to place a moratorium on tax foreclosures and tax lien sales for a period of up to five years after the COVID-19 covered period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.51 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.51 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08413 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES